Drury, Kathryn Jeanette (CPSO#: 69381)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brooklin Medical Centre
5959 Anderson Street
Brooklin ON  L1M 2E9
Phone: (905) 655-3321
Fax: (905) 655-4848
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Trench St.
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: 905 883-1212 Ext. 3223
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

10 Angeline St N
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Canada
Phone: 705-324-6111
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06

1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
Phone: 705-743-2121
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

580 Harwood Ave. S.
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: 905-683-2320
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

700 Gordon St.
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

CMHA
60 Bond St. W
Oshawa ON  L1G 1A5
Canada
Phone: (905) 436-9945
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kathryn Drury Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Drury ( CPSO# 69381 )
Dr. D. McNeill ( CPSO# 62691 )

Business Address:
Brooklin Medical Centre
5959 Anderson Street
Brooklin ON  L1M 2E9
Phone Number: (905) 655-3321

Business Address:
Axalta Coating Systems Canada
408 Fairall Street
Ajax ON  L1S 1R6
Phone Number: (905) 683-5500

Business Address:
E. I. Dupont
7070 Mississauga Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 2H3

Business Address:
Ontario Shores
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHRYN JEANETTE DRURY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRURY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1997