Drzymala, Lukasz (CPSO#: 79794)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
905-1243 Islington Ave
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone: (416) 233-4242 Ext. 3
Fax: (416) 233-4249
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Drzymala Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Drzymala ( CPSO# 79794 )

Business Address:
Suite 905
1243 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone Number: (416) 233-4242

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUKASZ DRZYMALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRZYMALA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2008