Du Bois, Elisabeth Jane (CPSO#: 77027)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Pretoria, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Frontenac Medical Associates
Suite 201
791 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1E9
Phone: (613) 542-7002
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.J. Du Bois Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Du Bois ( CPSO# 77027 )

Business Address:
Frontenac Medical Associates
Suite 201
791 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1E9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2727

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELISABETH JANE DU BOIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DU BOIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2001
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jan 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2002