Dube, Catherine (CPSO#: 61402)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 May 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 10239
Fax: (613) 761-5487
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catherine Dube Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dube ( CPSO# 61402 )

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4221

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7777

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 737-7777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE DUBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUBE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 6 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 1992