Dube, Magalie (CPSO#: 67190)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
195 Boul. Greber
Suite 01
Gatineau QC  J8T 3R1
Phone: 8195689119
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Dube Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 12 2014


Corporation Name: M. Dube Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dube ( CPSO# 67190 )

Business Address:
195 Boul. Greber
Suite 1
Gatineau QC  J8T 3R1
Phone Number: (819) 568-9119

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAGALIE DUBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUBE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993