Dubinski, William (CPSO#: 86178)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
Department of Anatomical Pathology
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 2421000 Ext. 62003
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dubinski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Dubinski ( CPSO# 86178 )

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 2H1
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3
Phone Number: (905) 790-3515

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM DUBINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUBINSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012