Dubois, Luc Andre Joseph (CPSO#: 82478)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Room E2 117
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8161
Fax: (519) 685-8278
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Luc Dubois Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. DeLyzer ( CPSO# 90554 )
Dr. L. Dubois ( CPSO# 82478 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Room E2 117
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8161

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Room E2 - 647
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 11 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUC ANDRE JOSEPH DUBOIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUBOIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2013