Duffett, Lisa Deborah Marie (CPSO#: 90443)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hosptial, General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Box 201A
Room L2244
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 71069
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 12 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA DEBORAH MARIE DUFFETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUFFETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Elective Trainee - Hematology

McMaster University, 03 Aug 2009 to 30 Aug 2009
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 8 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2012