Duffy, Catherine Maree (CPSO#: 68669)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Queensland, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Jan 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Jan 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1995
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jan 1997
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 27 Jan 1997
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997