Dufour, Marc Etienne (CPSO#: 71004)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Aug 2014

Summary

Date of Death: 19-Oct-2014

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:State University of Utrecht, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St Regis Crescent S, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1 Fax: 416-398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 26 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1997
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 May 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 04 May 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Aug 2014