Dugas, Geoffrey Ross (CPSO#: 76047)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58439
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G.R. Dugas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Dugas ( CPSO# 76047 )

Business Address:
Suite A-7
10886 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L7A 3R9
Phone Number: (905) 495-5200

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
Institute of Cosmetic and Laser Surgery
100 - 1344 Cornwall Road
Oakville ON  L6J 7W5
Phone Number: (905) 842-2262

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEOFFREY ROSS DUGAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUGAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006