Duggal, Anil (CPSO#: 78042)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Oct 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anil Duggal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Dobrovolskis ( CPSO# 59366 )
Dr. A. Duggal ( CPSO# 78042 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management LTd- Health Information Services 13-1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 28 Jul 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Kentucky

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 19 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANIL DUGGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUGGAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2015