Duggan, Laura Virginia (CPSO#: 74145)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 23 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 08 Feb 2005 to 04 Mar 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Mar 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013