Duggan, Michelle (CPSO#: 75431)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Ireland, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Mar 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004