Duggan, Scott Stanley (CPSO#: 72631)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 2604
Fax: (613) 548-1375
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Anaesthesia
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 549-3310
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

752 King Street West
Kingston
Ontario
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Canada
Phone: 613-544-4900
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott Duggan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Duggan ( CPSO# 72631 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310


Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Parlow ( CPSO# 53229 )
Dr. T. Saha ( CPSO# 78692 )
Dr. R. Tanzola ( CPSO# 76158 )
Dr. K. Turner ( CPSO# 55360 )
Dr. L. Wang ( CPSO# 59429 )
Dr. D. Sydor ( CPSO# 82811 )
Dr. M. Kahn ( CPSO# 85650 )
Dr. G. Klar ( CPSO# 111507)
Dr. G. Mizubuti ( CPSO# 101768)
Dr. A. Mir Ghassemi ( CPSO# 95204 )
Dr. I. Galvin ( CPSO# 91553 )
Dr. S. Ridi ( CPSO# 84478 )
Dr. G. Sudhakaran Nair ( CPSO# 85923 )
Dr. M. Cummings ( CPSO# 71070 )
Dr. J. Burjorjee ( CPSO# 73521 )
Dr. R. Allard ( CPSO# 85022 )
Dr. J. Erb ( CPSO# 79144 )
Dr. S. Duggan ( CPSO# 72631 )
Dr. M. Fleming ( CPSO# 71251 )
Dr. D. Engen ( CPSO# 73829 )
Dr. I. Gilron ( CPSO# 62229 )
Dr. S. Haley ( CPSO# 50665 )
Dr. R. Henry ( CPSO# 63132 )
Dr. A. Ho ( CPSO# 52926 )
Dr. M. Jaeger ( CPSO# 64665 )
Dr. D. Mark ( CPSO# 59595 )
Dr. M. McMullen ( CPSO# 79939 )
Dr. J. Murdoch ( CPSO# 78475 )
Dr. L. Patterson ( CPSO# 71791 )
Dr. C. Reimer ( CPSO# 79239 )
Dr. R. Rooney ( CPSO# 78503 )
Dr. V. Shyam ( CPSO# 81241 )
Dr. J. Van Vlymen ( CPSO# 62179 )
Dr. C. Haley ( CPSO# 104664)
Dr. J. Dion ( CPSO# 88602 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Providence Continuing Care Centre
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 20 May 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT STANLEY DUGGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUGGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 04 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 05 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2004