Duguay, Kirk John (CPSO#: 77059)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 May 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kirk J. Duguay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Duguay ( CPSO# 77059 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
36 Elgin Street
Sudbury ON  P3C 5B4
Phone Number: (705) 673-5615

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIRK JOHN DUGUAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUGUAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 19 Sep 2001 to 16 Oct 2001
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2013