Duke, Marin Jonina (CPSO#: 77278)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Jan 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 12
65 University Ave East
Waterloo ON  N2J 2V9
Phone: (519) 746-2220
Fax: (519) 746-2295
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

570 University Ave E.
Unit 4
Waterloo ON  N2K 4P2
Canada
Phone: (519) 880-1733
Fax: (519) 880-2687
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2002
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Executive Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2009
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 16 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 20 Aug 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 20 Aug 2011 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  August  20,  2011,  the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Marin Jonina Duke, in
            accordance with an undertaking  and consent given by Dr. Duke to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  I  shall  not  engage  in  the  following   area(s)  of  practice:  laser
                  therapy/treatments (directly or through delegation).