Dulay, Jaspal Singh (CPSO#: 82914)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
E6-004
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 76095
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dulay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dulay ( CPSO# 82914 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
E6-004A - 800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASPAL SINGH DULAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DULAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007