Dulay, Navdesh Kaur (CPSO#: 84464)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Integrated Health Care Centre
Units 21 and 22
6175 Highway 7
Vaughan ON  L4H 0P6
Phone: (905) 850-3091
Fax: (416) 840-8434
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAVDESH KAUR DULAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DULAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008