Dumitrascu, George Alexandru (CPSO#: 84125)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Apr 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Apr 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:McGill University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
1053 Carling Avenue B309
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4940
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona
USA - California
USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Apr 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Apr 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Mar 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   George  Alexandru  Dumitrascu  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            anaesthesia, only.