Dumont, Tania (CPSO#: 83292)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus - SEGWHC
Gynecology clinic, 7th floor
1967 Riverside Drive, Box 503
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 82054
Fax: (613) 738-8524
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CHEO
401 Smyth - C9 Clinic
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
Phone: 613-737-7600 Ext. 2425
Fax: (613) 738-4293
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Carson Medical Clinic
E876 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L3
Canada
Phone: (613) 742-8182
Fax: (613) 742-0430
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TANIA DUMONT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUMONT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010