Duncan, John Andrew (CPSO#: 72172)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 07 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1999
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002