Dunlop, Nicole Lynn (CPSO#: 92962)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Saint Vincent Hospital
Bruyere Continuing Care
Complex Continuing Care
60 Cambridge St N
Ottawa ON  K1R 7A5
Phone: (613) 562-6262
Fax: (613) 782-2820
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2604 Draper Ave
Redwoods Retirement Home
Ottawa ON  K2H 7A1
Canada
Phone: 613-828-8540
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Redwoods Retirement Home
2604 Draper Ave Ottawa ON
Ottawa ON  K2C 0C6
Canada
Phone: 613-828-8540
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE LYNN DUNLOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUNLOP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012