Dunn, Evelyn Louise (CPSO#: 95010)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 May 2011 to 20 May 2011
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 21 May 2011 to 03 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2011