Dunn, Jessica Katherine Elizabeth (CPSO#: 93929)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Boston University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hospital Eastern Ontario
Division of Infectious Diseases
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: 6137384832
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA KATHERINE ELIZABETH DUNN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUNN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 18 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 14 Jul 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2015