Dunne, Caitlin Maureen Harrigan (CPSO#: 95056)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 09 Mar 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 28 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Jun 2011 to 24 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 27 Feb 2012 to 09 Mar 2012
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2012