Duong, Hanh Heather (CPSO#: 97036)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306, 220 Dundas Street West
Whitby ON  L1N8M7
Phone: 9056659001
Fax: 9056659335
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Hospital Ct
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 2703
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hanh Duong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Duong ( CPSO# 97036 )

Business Address:
306 - 220 Dundas Street West
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7
Phone Number: (905) 665-9001

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANH HEATHER DUONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 21 Nov 2011 to 19 Dec 2011
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 13 Feb 2012 to 11 Mar 2012
Elective Trainee - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2012 to 16 Dec 2012
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Nephrology

McMaster University, 26 Aug 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 18 Oct 2013
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2014