Duong, Mylinh (CPSO#: 76944)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 12 Jul 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Adelaide, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
Room A3 76
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521 2100 Ext. 43566
Fax: (905) 389-0108
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Duong ( CPSO# 76944 )
Dr. J. Wang ( CPSO# 74854 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
95 Bayly Street West
Suite 505
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 683-0881

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 12 Jul 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jul 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2014 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Mylinh Duong may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        McMaster   University,   in  which  Dr.  Duong  holds  an  academic
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires when Dr. Duong no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.