Dupere, Marc (CPSO#: 70251)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Apr 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
VISAGE MD Clinic
Aesthetics in Cosmetic Plastic Surg
133 Hazelton Avenue, Suite 101
Toronto, ON M5R 0A6
Toronto ON  M5R 0A6
Phone: (416) 929-9800
Fax: (416) 368-3113
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

VISAGE MD Clinic Richmond Hill
13311 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 3L6
Canada
Phone: 416-929-9800
Fax: (416) 368-3113
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marc Dupere Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dupere ( CPSO# 70251 )

Business Address:
VISAGE MD Clinic
Aesthetics in Cosmetic Plastic Surg
133 Hazelton Avenue, Suite 101
Toronto ON  M5R 0A6
Phone Number: (416) 929-9800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC DUPERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUPERE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001