Dupuis, Marie Denise Genevieve (CPSO#: 86919)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
OakvilleTrafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: 905-845-2571
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: 416-494-2120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Genevieve Dupuis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dupuis ( CPSO# 86919 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
10886 Hurontario Street
A-7
Brampton ON  L7A 3R9
Phone Number: (905) 495-5200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE DENISE GENEVIEVE DUPUIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUPUIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2013