Durr, Georges (CPSO#: 113097)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Prism Eye Institute Mississauga
Millway Plaza
Unit 1
3200 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5L 1W8
Phone: 9054563937
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGES DURR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DURR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017