Durrani, Ahmad Irfan (CPSO#: 81956)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone: (905) 579-1212 Ext. 273
Fax: 289-731-2036
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Durrani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 15 2011


Corporation Name: Dr. Ahmad Durrani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2015


Corporation Name: Durrani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Durrani ( CPSO# 81956 )

Business Address:
Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone Number: (905) 579-1212

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMAD IRFAN DURRANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DURRANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2004 to 22 Dec 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Dec 2004 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2005 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2006 to 19 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2006