Dusseault, Laurie Ellen (CPSO#: 79057)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone: (519) 804-9234
Fax: (519) 804-2604
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laurie Dusseault Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Dusseault ( CPSO# 79057 )

Business Address:
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone Number: (519) 804-9234

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURIE ELLEN DUSSEAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUSSEAULT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2005