Dutt, Monika (CPSO#: 79166)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, French, Spanish

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jan 2007 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONIKA DUTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2018