Dutta, Sanjeev (CPSO#: 74336)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 20 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 10 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1999 to 31 Oct 1999
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 2007