Duvel, Hercules Morkel (CPSO#: 108498)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English, German

Education:University of Pretoria, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 1 - 3 Easy St Logannolme Queensland 4165 Australia
Date Received: 14 May 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018