Duwyn, Rejean Paul (CPSO#: 86518)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
807 St. George St.
Port Dover ON  N0A 1N0
Phone: 519-583-2225
Fax: 519-583-2250
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rejean Duwyn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Duwyn ( CPSO# 86518 )

Business Address:
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Phone Number: (519) 429-6975

Business Address:
807 St. George Street
Port Dover ON  N0A 1N0
Phone Number: (519) 583-2225

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REJEAN PAUL DUWYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUWYN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2009