Dwight, Prabo Jeshuran (CPSO#: 80965)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 11
10035 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Z 0E6
Phone: (905) 453-2441
Fax: (905) 453-4624
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (416) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Brampton Family Health
10035 Hurontario Street, Unit 11
Brampton ON  L6Z 0E6
Canada
Phone: (905) 453-2441
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dwight Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Dwight ( CPSO# 80965 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Division of Paediatrics Neonatology
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Business Address:
Brampton Family Health
Unit 11
10035 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Z 0E6
Phone Number: (905) 453-2441

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRABO JESHURAN DWIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DWIGHT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 06 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008