Dwilow, Rachel Ann (CPSO#: 91420)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 27 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 28 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 25 Aug 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2015