Dwivedi, Girish (CPSO#: 96790)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 01 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Delhi, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Girish Dwivedi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 27 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India
United Kingdom

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 09 Sep 2011 to 09 Nov 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 10 Nov 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Feb 2017