Dwyer, Tim (CPSO#: 94194)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Womens College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6482
Fax: (416) 323-6483
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mt Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6482
Fax: (416) 323-6483
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tim Dwyer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Dwyer ( CPSO# 94194 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Phone Number: (416) 846-0752

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 846-0752

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIM DWYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DWYER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011