Dy, Jessica Garcia (CPSO#: 73657)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
D4 Clinic 4th Floor Section D
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4522
Fax: (613) 761-4915
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

7th Floor, Benign Gynecology Clinic
SEGreenberg Women's Health Centre
Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 81724
Fax: (613) 738-8524
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jessica Dy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dy ( CPSO# 73657 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Riverside Hospital
1967 Riverside Drive
7th Floor
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Business Address:
Ottawa Civic Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4522

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 25 Aug 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA GARCIA DY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 15 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 16 Sep 2003 to 25 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004