Dyason, Claire Guinevere (CPSO#: 91148)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Palliative Care Office
The Ottawa Hospital - General Site
501 Smyth Road, Ottawa ON
Ottawa ON  K1H8L6
Phone: 613-737-8899 Ext. 78940
Fax: 613-739-6182
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAIRE GUINEVERE DYASON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DYASON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2013