Dyck, Christopher James (CPSO#: 77923)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
D1 - 2355 Keele St
Toronto ON  M6M 4A2
Phone: (416) 243-8487
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher J. Dyck Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dyck ( CPSO# 77923 )

Business Address:
Suite D1
2355 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 4A2
Phone Number: (416) 243-8487

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JAMES DYCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DYCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007