Dye, Audrey Anita (CPSO#: 84811)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Feb 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Guyana, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 440-3600
Fax: (905) 697-7745
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

27 Tapscott Road. Unit:1
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y7
Canada
Phone: (416) 644-3536
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Audrey A. Dye Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dye ( CPSO# 84811 )

Business Address:
222 King Street West
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 440-3600

Business Address:
Unit 1
27 Tapscott Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y7
Phone Number: (416) 644-3536

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AUDREY ANITA DYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DYE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 09 Oct 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2009