Dziak, Peter Michael (CPSO#: 95744)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Meno Ya Win Way
PO Box 909
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Phone: 807 737 5111
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Dziak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Dziak ( CPSO# 95744 )

Business Address:
17 Government Road
Wawa ON  P0S 1K0
Phone Number: (705) 856-1313

Business Address:
1 Meno Ya Wan Way
PO Box 909
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Phone Number: (807) 737-3030

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut
Yukon

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  November 26, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On December 17, 2018, Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Health Centre (SLHC) notified the College, pursuant to s. 33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that the locum privileges held by Dr. Peter Dziak at SLHC were suspended effective November 26, 2018, and that his appointment at SLHC terminated effective December 31, 2018.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 10 Oct 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER MICHAEL DZIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DZIAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2013

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: December 18, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective May 29, 2015, where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

(1) Criminal Harassment on or about November 24 2018 at the City of Thunder Bay, contrary to Section 264(1) of the Criminal Code.

(2) Fail to comply with an undertaking to an officer (bail conditions) on or about November 28, 2018 at the City of Thunder Bay, contrary to Section 145(5.1) of the Criminal Code.

(3) Criminal Harassment on or about November 28, 2018 at the City of Thunder Bay, contrary to Section 264(1) of the Criminal Code.

Date of charges: November 30, 2018; December 3 2018
Place of charges: Thunder Bay, Ontario
Thunder Bay Police Service


Source: Other
Active Date: December 18, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective December 4, 2014, the College By-laws require members to report to the College any currently existing conditions of release (“bail conditions”) following a charge for a criminal or provincial offence or subsequent to a finding of guilt and pending appeal.

The following are conditions of release made against this member:

[December 12, 2018]

1. Reside at specified address;

2. Remain in your residence daily except/unless in the presence of specified persons;

3. Remain in Toronto, ON except for required court appearances;

4. Not to contact or communicate in any with either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with specified persons;

5. Not to possess any weapon(s) as defined by the Criminal Code of Canada;

6. Not to have any access to the internet.