Beattie, Erin Dawn (CPSO#: 90571)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
220 Bagot St
Kingston ON  K7L 3G2
Phone: (613) 533 9303
Fax: (613) 544 9899
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite C-01 Unit B
310 Bridge St West
Napanee ON  K7R 0A4
Canada
Phone: (613) 354 7640
Fax: (613) 354 7435
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06

275 Sydenham St
Kingston ON  K7K 1G7
Canada
Phone: (613) 549-4164
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert A. Beattie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Beattie ( CPSO# 28645 )
Dr. E. Beattie ( CPSO# 90571 )

Business Address:
Parklane Plaza
Unit 8A
815 High Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 8J9
Phone Number: (705) 742-2112

Business Address:
Bell Tower Plaza
365 North Front Street
Unit 15A
Belleville ON  K8P 5A5
Phone Number: (613) 967-2228

Business Address:
1414 King Street East
Unit 32
Courtice ON  L1E 3B4
Phone Number: (905) 743-0090


Corporation Name: Erin Beattie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Beattie ( CPSO# 90571 )

Business Address:
Suite C01 Unit B
310 Bridge Street West
Napanee ON  K7R 0A4
Phone Number: (613) 354-7640

Business Address:
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9

Business Address:
275 Sydenham Street
Kingston ON  K7K 1G7
Phone Number: (613) 549-4164

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN DAWN BEATTIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEATTIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011