Hirvi, Edward Reino (CPSO#: 84322)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Group Health Centre
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 541-2699
Fax: (705) 759-7460
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

FJ Davey Home
733 Third Line East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 7C1
Canada
Phone: 7059422204
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Rd.
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-3434
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )
Dr. A. Schamp ( CPSO# 82979 )
Dr. C. Kuntz ( CPSO# 84476 )
Dr. M. Hemy ( CPSO# 86777 )
Dr. K. Zufelt ( CPSO# 67007 )
Dr. J. Lane ( CPSO# 61549 )
Dr. D. Fritz ( CPSO# 60812 )
Dr. B. Mitchell ( CPSO# 59931 )
Dr. S. Bondar ( CPSO# 59698 )
Dr. M. Keating ( CPSO# 57489 )
Dr. M. Mogharrabi ( CPSO# 57473 )
Dr. C. Bruni ( CPSO# 55651 )
Dr. M. Edwards ( CPSO# 52889 )
Dr. R. Wytsma ( CPSO# 52032 )
Dr. M. Mathew ( CPSO# 44024 )
Dr. M. Hackett ( CPSO# 33820 )
Dr. D. Fera ( CPSO# 33299 )
Dr. K. Opryszczko ( CPSO# 89989 )
Dr. J. Keuhl ( CPSO# 88070 )
Dr. E. Hirvi ( CPSO# 84322 )
Dr. D. Micomonaco ( CPSO# 80815 )
Dr. J. Reich ( CPSO# 73103 )
Dr. S. Allen ( CPSO# 73014 )
Dr. B. Slagel ( CPSO# 79472 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. J. Bishop ( CPSO# 96910 )
Dr. M. Jenkins ( CPSO# 99889 )
Dr. J. Jonusaitis ( CPSO# 100796)
Dr. L. Bonder ( CPSO# 90576 )
Dr. W. Wallace ( CPSO# 92960 )
Dr. H. Gupta ( CPSO# 78301 )
Dr. K. Taylor ( CPSO# 75094 )
Dr. G. Yee ( CPSO# 70560 )
Dr. W. Chung ( CPSO# 99567 )
Dr. B. Banks ( CPSO# 99188 )
Dr. V. Coccimiglio ( CPSO# 101205)
Dr. M. Vance ( CPSO# 101038)
Dr. S. Buehner ( CPSO# 65582 )
Dr. P. Zehr ( CPSO# 59997 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 62320 )
Dr. M. Wilson ( CPSO# 69274 )
Dr. C. Kobelka ( CPSO# 62567 )
Dr. A. Fam ( CPSO# 62586 )
Dr. C. Rossi ( CPSO# 51523 )
Dr. P. Ciaschini ( CPSO# 52948 )
Dr. P. Bragaglia ( CPSO# 33769 )
Dr. M. Leahy ( CPSO# 57088 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 72520 )

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 549-5540

Business Address:
974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C2
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540


Corporation Name: Drs. Bonder & Hirvi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Hirvi ( CPSO# 84322 )
Dr. L. Bonder ( CPSO# 90576 )

Business Address:
Group Health Centre
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 541-2699

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
733 Third Line East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 7C1
Phone Number: (705) 942-2204

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD REINO HIRVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIRVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008