Easo, James George (CPSO#: 76168)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte St S
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Phone: (905) 876-7026
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Easo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Easo ( CPSO# 76168 )

Business Address:
Milton District Hospital
7030 Derry Road East
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone Number: (905) 876-7026

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES GEORGE EASO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EASO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2003