Eaton, Christopher John (CPSO#: 76276)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Sep 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. J. Eaton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 26 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2015
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 15 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 07 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 06 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 20 Oct 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 20 Oct 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from September 7, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Christopher John
            Eaton, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Eaton to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. CHRISTOPHER JOHN EATON
                                          ("Dr. Eaton")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Eaton, certificate of registration number 76276, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Eaton, acknowledge that this undertaking replaces my May 7, 2014
                  and September 15, 2016 Undertakings with the College.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Eaton, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Eaton, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), to continue until the reassessment of my practice,
                        set out in (7) below ("Clinical Supervision"). Clinical Supervision
                        shall cease only upon approval from the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Eaton, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once two weeks for the first three
                              months and every month thereafter further to the
                              recommendation of my supervisor and the approval of the
                              College;
                  
                        (ii)  Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting, or as many patient charts as are available to be
                              reviewed if I have not seen fifteen (15) patients since my
                              last meeting with the Clinical Supervisor;
                  
                        (iii) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (iv)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (v)   Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vi)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Eaton, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                        report(s) of the medical assessor, and concerns that may arise
                        during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Eaton, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Eaton, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Eaton, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Eaton, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Eaton, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Eaton, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all of the following professional education (the "Professional
                        Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a program(s) satisfactory to the College in: 
                  
                              1.    medical record keeping; and
                  
                              2.    safe opioid prescibing 
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Eaton, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Eaton, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Eaton, undertake to complete this requirement by within
                        three months or, if no satisfactory program is available by that
                        time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Eaton, undertake that, approximately three to six (3-6)
                        months after the completion of the Professional Education set out
                        in section (6) above, I will submit to a reassessment of my
                        practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected
                        by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge that the
                        Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation of my
                        care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Eaton, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Eaton, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Eaton, acknowledge that if I am of the view that any of the
                        Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have thirty
                        (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within which
                        to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further acknowledge that thereafter, the ICR Committee will
                        consider my submissions and make a determination regarding whether
                        or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if
                        so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Eaton, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (7)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Eaton, hereby consent to the following being included on the
                        public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (7)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Eaton, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Eaton, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                        patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Eaton, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Eaton, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS,
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "B" and Appendix "C",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Eaton, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Eaton, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Eaton, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Eaton, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Eaton, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Eaton, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Eaton, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Eaton, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Eaton will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College.

                              Dr. Eaton will engage in professional education in record
                              keeping and opioid prescribing.
                  
                              Dr. Eaton's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within 3-6 months of the end of the
                              period of Professional Education.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Eaton, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Eaton, give my irrevocable consent to the College  to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any hospital or Practice Location where I practise
                  or have privileges ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of
                  Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances
                  of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from
                  the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Eaton, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 7, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Christopher John Eaton to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 7, 2017:

Dr. Eaton will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.

Dr. Eaton will engage in professional education in record keeping and opioid prescribing.

Dr. Eaton’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 3-6 months of the end of the period of Professional Education.